GA HB424 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-15-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions regarding street gang terrorism and prevention, so as to include certain sex crimes into the definition of criminal gang activity; to revise a definition; to amend Title 24 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to evidence, so as to revise rules pertaining to the admissibility of a complainant's past sexual behavior in prosecutions for certain sexual offenses; to provide for exceptions; to provide for related matters; to provide for applicability; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; include certain sex crimes into the definition of criminal gang activity
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Micah Gravley [R] |
Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #374 (Y: 161 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #412 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #336 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #196 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #412 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #336 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #196 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-18 | Act 31 | |
2019-04-18 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-21 | House | House Hopper |