GA HB431 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act incorporating the City of Culloden in the County of Monroe, approved October 24, 1887 (Ga. L. 1886-87, Vol. II, p. 655), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 15, 1988 (Ga. L. 1988, p. 4086), and an Act approved April 4, 1990 (Ga. L. 1990, p. 5207), so as to provide for elections and terms of members of the city council; to change the election of councilmembers from district to at-large; to provide for submission of this Act for preclearance under the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Culloden, City of; elections and terms of members of city council; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #170 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House Vote #95 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House Vote #95 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Effective Date | |
2013-04-24 | Act 65 | |
2013-04-24 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-21 | House | House Hopper |