GA HB431 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide for an additional $10,000.00 homestead exemption from certain City of Alpharetta ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes, approved April 23, 1999 (Ga. L. 1999, p. 4836), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 11, 2009 (Ga. L. 2009, p. 4001), so as to increase the exemption amount from $40,000.00 to $45,000.00; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal under certain circumstances; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Alpharetta, City of; ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes; increase homestead exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #188 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Vote #80 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Vote #80 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-30 | Act 115 | |
2019-04-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-21 | House | House Hopper |