GA HB432 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to revenue and taxation, so as to modify the rate of tax imposed on the Georgia taxable net income of individuals; to add Georgia income tax paid by an individual to Georgia taxable net income to the extent such tax was deducted in determining federal taxable income; to provide for an earned income tax credit; to provide for rules and regulations; to amend an Act approved March 2, 2018 (Ga. L. 2018, p. 8), which lowered the personal and corporate income tax rates, so as to repeal certain conflicting provisions related to personal income tax rates; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; tax imposed on the Georgia taxable net income of individuals; modify rate

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-22HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-21HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback