GA HB454 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to provide for the operation of motorized mobility devices; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; operation of motorized mobility devices; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #408 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #413 (Y: 135 N: 20 NV: 12 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #219 (Y: 133 N: 28 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Effective Date
2019-04-26 Act 56
2019-04-26HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-11HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-04-02HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2019-04-02SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-04-02SenateSenate Third Read
2019-04-02SenateSenate Taken from Table
2019-03-29SenateSenate Tabled
2019-03-26SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-04HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-26HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-25HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-22HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback