GA HB458 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 25 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to regulation of fire and other hazards to persons and property generally, so as to prohibit the use of class B fire-fighting foam for testing purposes if such foam contains a certain class of fluorinated organic chemicals; to provide for definitions; to provide for exceptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Fire protection and safety; use of class B fire-fighting foam for testing purposes if such foam contains a certain class of fluorinated organic chemicals; prohibit
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Gullett [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Timothy Barr [R] | Rep. Vance Smith [R] |
Rep. Beth Moore [D] | Rep. Kevin Cooke [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #384 (Y: 159 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #303 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #182 (Y: 170 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #303 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #182 (Y: 170 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 235 | |
2019-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House Hopper |