GA HB470 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 6A of Chapter 3 of Title 35 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to DNA sampling, collection, and analysis, so as to provide for analysis and collection of DNA for individuals charged with a felony offense but sentenced as a first offender or under conditional discharge; to revise definitions; to change provisions relating to dissemination of information in the data bank; to change provisions relating to expungement of profiles in the data bank; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Law enforcement officers and agencies; analysis and collection of DNA for individuals charged with a felony offense but sentenced as a first offender or under conditional discharge; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Sainz [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] |
Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] | Sen. William Ligon [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #416 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #418 (Y: 126 N: 29 NV: 14 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #220 (Y: 143 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #418 (Y: 126 N: 29 NV: 14 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #220 (Y: 143 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-28 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-28 | Act 70 | |
2019-04-28 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House Hopper |