GA HB471 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to cancellation, suspension, and revocation of licenses, so as to revise the implied consent notices; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; implied consent notices; revise
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Sainz [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Dewayne Hill [R] |
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #214 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #142 (Y: 158 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #142 (Y: 158 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-28 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-28 | Act 69 | |
2019-04-28 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House Hopper |