GA HB474 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 9 of Title 34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to workers' compensation, so as to require certain procedures prior to the adoption, amendment, or repeal of any rules of the State Board of Workers' Compensation; to provide for exceptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Labor and industrial relations; certain procedures prior to the adoption, amendment, or repeal of any rules of the State Board of Workers' Compensation; require
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-10 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2020-03-10 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House Hopper |