GA HB476 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Subpart 2 of Part 1 of Article 16 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to compulsory attendance for students in elementary and secondary education, so as to provide that child entertainer students performing during one or more school days shall not be counted absent from school; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; child entertainer students performing during one or more school days shall not be counted absent from school; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Valencia Stovall [D] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Dave Belton [R] | Rep. Todd Jones [R] |
Rep. Beth Moore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House Hopper |