GA HB481 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Veto V3
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Veto V3
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to enact the Jobs, Opportunity, and Business Success Act of 2009; to amend and enact provisions intended to provide for tax relief and encourage employment opportunities and business stimulation; to amend Title 14 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to corporations, partnerships, and associations, so as to provide for a period of time for the waiver of certain filing fees otherwise charged in connection with such entities; to amend Title 34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to labor and industrial relations, so as to provide that for a period of time employers who hire persons receiving employment security benefits shall be entitled to a credit against employer contributions; to amend Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, the "Georgia Public Revenue Code," so as to provide for a graduated elimination of the corporate income tax; to provide for other related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Jobs, Opportunity, and Business Success Act of 2009; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Burkalter [R] | Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] | Rep. Tom Graves [R] | Rep. Jerry Keen [R] |
Rep. Tom Rice [R] | Sen. Chip Rogers [R] | Rep. Martin Scott [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #434 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #433 - Motion For The Previous Question (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #481 - Adopt Ccr (Y: 112 N: 52 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #264 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #213 - Pass (Y: 164 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #433 - Motion For The Previous Question (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #481 - Adopt Ccr (Y: 112 N: 52 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #264 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #213 - Pass (Y: 164 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Veto V3 | |
2009-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-15 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2009-04-03 | House Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed | |
2009-03-30 | House Conference Committee Appointed | |
2009-03-30 | House Insists | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Insists | |
2009-03-30 | House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-20 | Senate Recommitted | |
2009-03-19 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-18 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-09 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-09 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2009-03-05 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-19 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-18 | House First Readers |