GA HB481 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide for the creation of one or more community improvement districts in the Town of Braselton, approved May 29, 2007 (Ga. L. 2007, p. 4100), so as to correct the initial terms of office for board members; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Braselton, Town of; initial terms of office for board members; correct
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #685 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - House Vote #137 - Local Calendar (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 19 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - House Vote #137 - Local Calendar (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 19 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 490 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-11 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-11 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-10 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-08 | House First Readers |