GA HB481 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 1 of the O.C.G.A., relating to persons and their rights; to amend Article 5 of Chapter 12 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to abortion; to amend Chapter 9A of Title 31 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the "Woman's Right to Know Act;" to amend Chapter 9B of Title 31 of the O.C.G.A., relating to physician's obligation in performance of abortions; to amend Chapter 7 of Title 19 of the O.C.G.A., relating to parent and child relationship generally; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Living Infants Fairness and Equality (LIFE) Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #343 (Y: 92 N: 78 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #344 (Y: 79 N: 91 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #220 (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #226 (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #227 (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #216 (Y: 70 N: 96 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #217 (Y: 93 N: 73 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #218 (Y: 73 N: 93 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-01 Effective Date
2019-05-07 Act 234
2019-05-07HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2019-03-22SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-22SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-22SenateSenate Engrossed
2019-03-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-18SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-27HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-26HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-25HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20192020/HB/481
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/182762.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/183985.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/184245.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/184812.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/187013.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16807
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16806
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16805
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16947
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16946
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16940
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17114
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17113

Bill Comments

feedback