GA HB491 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 13 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance holding company systems, so as to update the regulation of insurance company holding systems; to provide for definitions; to provide the Commissioner with new supervisory authority; to provide for enforcement authority; to provide for confidentiality; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; regulation of insurance company holding systems; update

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #279 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #128 (Y: 154 N: 3 NV: 16 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Effective Date
2019-05-10 Act 317
2019-05-10HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-08HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-18SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-05HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-05HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-27HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-26HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-26HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback