GA HB492 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 7 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to dispossessory proceedings, so as require applications for execution of a writ of possession be made within 30 days of the issuance of the writ unless good cause is shown; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Property; dispossessory proceedings; require applications for execution of a writ of possession be made within 30 days of issuance of the writ unless good cause is shown
Sponsors
Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] | Rep. Beth Moore [D] | Rep. Matthew Wilson [D] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] |
Sen. Jesse Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #413 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #415 (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #161 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #415 (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #161 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 230 | |
2019-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-26 | House | House Hopper |