GA HB493 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 11 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Youth Conservation Corps, so as to change certain provisions relating to creation and purposes of the corps and rules and regulations related thereto; to change certain provisions relating to the director and administration of corps programs; to change certain provisions relating to location of and contracts for projects and prohibited uses of corps members; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Youth Conservation Corps; creation and purposes of the corps; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Tyrone Brooks [D] | Rep. Mark Burkalter [R] | Rep. Jerry Keen [R] | Rep. Larry O'Neal [R] |
Rep. DuBose Porter [D] | Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Sen. Dan Weber [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #805 - Passage As Amended (Y: 32 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #280 - Pass (Y: 161 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #280 - Pass (Y: 161 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-20 | Act 428 | |
2010-05-20 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-27 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Taken from Table | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Tabled | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-11 | Senate Recommitted | |
2010-01-11 | Senate Taken from Table | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Tabled | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-17 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-09 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-24 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-19 | House First Readers |