GA HB50 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to abolish the office of elected county surveyor of Lincoln County; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Lincoln County; office of elected county surveyor; abolish
Sponsors
Rep. Tom McCall [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #24 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Vote #14 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Vote #14 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-02 | Act 6 | |
2019-04-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-06 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-28 | House | House Hopper |