GA HB507 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to ad valorem taxation of property, so as to revise the criteria used by tax assessors to determine the fair market value of real property; to provide an effective date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad valorem tax; criteria used by tax assessors to determine the fair market value of real property; revise
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Wilensky [D] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Spencer Frye [D] |
Rep. James Beverly [D] | Rep. Teri Anulewicz [D] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #220 (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #225 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #184 (Y: 164 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #225 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #184 (Y: 164 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 223 | |
2019-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-08 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Hopper |