GA HB509 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to abolish the State Medical Education Board and provide that the Georgia Board for Physician Workforce shall succeed to the powers, rights, and duties of said abolished board; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Medical Education Board; abolish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #279 - Passage (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Vote #180 - Passage (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Vote #180 - Passage (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-11 | Act 113 | |
2011-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-21 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-16 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-16 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-14 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-11 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-10 | House First Readers |