GA HB51 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Quitman County Water and Sewerage Authority, approved March 27, 1998 (Ga. L. 1998, p. 3702), so as to change the number of members serving on the authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Quitman County Water and Sewerage Authority; change number of members serving on authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #74 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Vote #14 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Vote #14 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-02 | Act 7 | |
2019-04-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-06 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-28 | House | House Hopper |