GA HB514 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 37 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to governing and regulation of mental health, so as to create the Georgia Mental Health Reform and Innovation Commission; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for a definition; to provide for members and officers; to provide for meetings, agendas, quorum, and compensation; to provide for the commission's duties and powers; to provide for subcommittees; to provide for automatic repeal; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Mental Health Reform and Innovation Commission; create

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #381 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #346 (Y: 150 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #215 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #208 (Y: 152 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Effective Date
2019-05-06 Act 216
2019-05-06HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-11HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-04-02SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2019-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2019-03-21SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-21SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-18SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-28HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-27HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback