GA HB527 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-2-161 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Quality Basic Education Formula, so as to change program weights for funding purposes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Quality Basic Education Formula; change program weights for funding purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #275 (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #305 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #200 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #305 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #200 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-02 | Act 133 | |
2019-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-08 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Hopper |