GA HB538 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to state administrative organization of revenue and taxation; to amend Article 2 of Chapter 2 of Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to administration of revenue and taxation; to amend Chapter 13A of Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to tax tribunals, so as to require that all questions of law decided by the Georgia Tax Tribunal be decided without deference to the rules, determinations, or interpretations of the Department of Revenue; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; all questions of law decided by the Georgia Tax Tribunal be decided without deference to the rules, determinations, or interpretations of the Department of Revenue; require
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House Vote #458 (Y: 158 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-01-31 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-14 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-28 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/55596 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/183275 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/55596#17378 |