GA HB54 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Subpart 7 of Part 3 of Article 7 of Chapter 3 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to grants to children of law enforcement officers, firefighters, and prison guards, so as to provide for undergraduate full tuition grants to children of law enforcement officers, firefighters, prison guards, and Highway Emergency Response Operators of the Department of Transportation who were killed in the line of duty who attend institutions of the University System of Georgia and who meet certain eligibility requirements; to provide a definition; to provide for voluntary donations through state income tax returns and drivers' licenses for funding; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Tuition grants; children of officers killed in line of duty who attend University System institutions and meet certain requirements; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Keisha Waites [D] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Sheila Jones [D] |
Rep. Virgil Fludd [D] | Sen. Nan Orrock [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #858 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #651 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #701 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #651 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #701 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 520 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2015-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-01-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-14 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-13 | House | House Hopper |