GA HB54 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act authorizing the governing authority of the City of Fitzgerald to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A., approved May 8, 2018 (Ga. L. 2018, p. 4068), so as to align said Act with the provisions of general law and City of Fitzgerald's resolution related to the expenditure of funds from the levy of an excise tax on lodging; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Fitzgerald, City of; levy an excise tax
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #24 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Vote #14 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Vote #14 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-02 | Act 9 | |
2019-04-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-06 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-28 | House | House Hopper |