GA HB551 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 13 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to controlled substances, so as to provide for legislative findings; to provide a definition; to provide for the identification of a standard level of kratom alkoloids and establish recommended dosages; to provide for the prohibition of access to kratom to persons under 18 years of age; to provide for package labeling requirements; to provide for penalties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances; kratom; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #382 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #355 (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #277 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #211 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26 Effective Date
2019-04-26 Act 59
2019-04-26HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-11HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-04-02SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2019-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2019-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted As Amended
2019-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-26SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-04HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-28HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback