GA HB570 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 27 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the lottery for education, so as to provide for sports betting in this state; to provide for definitions; to provide for a Georgia sports betting director; to provide for the comprehensive regulation of sports betting and related activities; to provide for the issuance, renewal, denial, and revocation of permits; to provide for restrictions and penalties; to provide for the promulgation of rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to provide for a contingent effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State government; sports betting in this state; provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House Hopper |