GA HB583 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Insurance and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Insurance and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to provide a framework for regulating the offering or issuance of travel insurance in this state; to revise and provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; framework for regulating the offering or issuance of travel insurance in this state; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House Vote #477 (Y: 157 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-07 | House | House Hopper |