GA HB598 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Veto V1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Veto V1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for a new charter for the City of Harlem, approved May 12, 2008 (Ga. L. 2008, p. 3654), as amended, so as to change the corporate boundaries of the city; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Harlem, City of; change corporate boundaries
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. Jodi Lott [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #304 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Vote #241 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Vote #241 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Veto V1 | |
2019-05-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-11 | House | House Hopper |