GA HB600 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create a board of commissioners of roads and revenue for the County of Monroe, approved August 19, 1907 (Ga. L. 1907, p. 318), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 11, 2011 (Ga. L. 2011, p. 3912), so as to provide for the removal of the duties of disbursements; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Monroe County; Board of Commissioners; provide for the removal of the duties of disbursements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #249 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Vote #241 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Vote #241 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 285 | |
2019-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-08 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-28 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-11 | House | House Hopper |