GA HB603 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the compensation of the members of the County Board of Education of Floyd County, approved March 18, 1959 (Ga. L. 1959, p. 3203), as amended, so as to provide for the compensation of the members of such board of education; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Floyd County; Board of Education; provide for compensation of members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #249 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Vote #241 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Vote #241 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-02 | Act 20 | |
2019-04-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-11 | House | House Hopper |