GA HB61 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to require motor vehicle insurance companies to offer qualified active duty military service members between the ages of 18 and 24 motor vehicle insurance policies underwritten at rates for such service members 25 years of age or older; to provide for related matters; to provide for a short title; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicle insurance companies; offer qualified active duty military service members between the ages of 18 and 24 motor vehicle insurance policies underwritten at rates for such service members 25 years of age or older; require
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Glanton [D] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Rep. Carl Gilliard [D] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-28 | House | House Hopper |