GA HB615 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-21 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-21 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a board of elections and registration for Douglas County, approved May 13, 2008 (Ga. L. 2008, p. 3880), so as to provide for composition of the board and the selection and appointment of members; to provide for related matters; to provide for submission for preclearance under Section 5 of the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Douglas County; board of elections and registration; composition of board and selection and appointment of members; provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-20 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-14 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/39897 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20132014/134597 |