GA HB625 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of Coweta County to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Coweta County; levy an excise tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #274 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Vote #267 (Y: 147 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Vote #267 (Y: 147 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-30 | Act 88 | |
2019-04-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-08 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-18 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-14 | House | House Hopper |