GA HB63 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 24 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance generally, so as to require health benefit plans to establish step therapy protocols; to provide for a step therapy exception process; to provide for definitions; to provide for statutory construction; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; health benefit plans to establish step therapy protocols; require
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] |
Rep. Michael Wilensky [D] | Rep. Angelika Kausche [D] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #363 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #237 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House Vote #38 (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #237 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House Vote #38 (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-25 | Act 43 | |
2019-04-25 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-28 | House | House Hopper |