GA HB630 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to state government, so as to provide that this state shall observe daylight savings time year round; to provide for contingent effectiveness; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State government; observe daylight savings time year round; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] | Rep. Michael Caldwell [R] | Rep. Lynn Smith [R] | Rep. Karen Mathiak [R] |
Rep. Jeff Jones [R] | Rep. Heath Clark [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-18 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-14 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/55940 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/184699 |