GA HB635 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 30 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the "Disabled Adults and Elder Persons Protection Act," so as to provide for the establishment of at-risk adult protective investigative/coordinating teams to coordinate the investigation of and responses to suspected instances of abuse, neglect, or exploitation of disabled adults or elder persons; to provide for a definition; to provide for immunity; to provide for coordination with the director of the Division of Aging Services; to provide for the composition, duties, and responsibilities of the at-risk adult protective investigative/coordinating teams; to provide for memoranda of understanding; to provide for confidentiality of records; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Disabled Adults and Elder Persons Protection Act; at-risk adult protection investigative/coordinating teams; provide establishment
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Tommy Benton [R] | Rep. Sheila Jones [D] | Rep. Bruce Broadrick [R] |
Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #726 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Vote #512 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Vote #512 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-07 | Act 418 | |
2018-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-30 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-28 | House | House Hopper |