GA HB64 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 7 of Title 19 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to parent and child relationship general provisions, so as to require child welfare agencies to make efforts to determine whether a parent or guardian of a child who is the subject of abuse allegations is on active duty in the military; to require certain notifications to military installation family advocacy programs; to provide for the reporting of child abuse to military law enforcement in certain situations; to provide for immunity for the reporting of child abuse to military law enforcement; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Protecting Military Children Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Prince [D] | Rep. Dave Belton [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] |
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #238 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Vote #95 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Vote #95 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 268 | |
2019-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-28 | House | House Hopper |