GA HB645 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the City of Brookhaven in DeKalb County, approved April 16, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 5527), as amended, so as to increase the existing general homestead exemption to $40,000.00 through five annual increases; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Brookhaven, City of; existing general homestead exemption; increase
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #374 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #294 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #294 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 165 | |
2019-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-22 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Hopper |