GA HB650 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Gainesville, approved April 11, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 4870), so as to change the corporate boundaries of the city by annexing certain territory; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Gainesville, City of; change corporate boundaries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #374 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #310 (Y: 152 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #310 (Y: 152 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 170 | |
2019-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-22 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Hopper |