GA HB651 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Gainesville Redevelopment Authority, approved March 24, 1978 (Ga. L. 1978, p. 4440), which authority was authorized pursuant to an amendment to the Constitution as contained in Ga. L. 1980, p. 2024, as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 11, 2009 (Ga. L. 2009, p. 4105), so as to provide for reappointment; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Gainesville Redevelopment Authority; provide for reappointment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #374 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #294 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #294 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 171 | |
2019-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-22 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Hopper |