GA HB658 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 13 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to excise tax on rooms, lodgings, and accommodations, so as to remove the sunset date for the time during which a certain excise tax on rooms, lodgings, and accommodations may be collected; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Excise tax; rooms, lodgings, and accommodations; remove sunset date for the time during which a certain tax may be collected
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #822 (Y: 154 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #693 (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #719 (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Vote #453 (Y: 157 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #693 (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #719 (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Vote #453 (Y: 157 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 324 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-31 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-01-31 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-01-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-10 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-09 | House | House Hopper |
2017-12-15 | House | House Prefiled |