GA HB66 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 2 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to prestige license plates and special license plates for certain persons and vehicles, so as to provide for the issuance of certain special license plates for motorcycles; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Special license plates; certain special plates for motorcycles; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Hugley [D] | Rep. Al Williams [D] | Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Winfred Dukes [D] |
Rep. Dewey McClain [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-28 | House | House Hopper |