GA HB682 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Camden County Spaceport Authority; to provide for a short title; to confer powers and impose duties on the authority; to provide for the membership and the appointment of members of the authority and their terms of office, qualifications, duties, powers, and compensation; to provide for vacancies, organization, meetings, and expenses; to prohibit authority employees and members from having certain interests; to provide for definitions; to provide for venue and jurisdiction; to provide for authority purpose; to provide for charges; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for tort immunity; to provide for liberal construction; to provide related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Camden County Spaceport Authority Act; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #374 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #310 (Y: 152 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #310 (Y: 152 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 179 | |
2019-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-25 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-25 | House | House Hopper |