GA HB683 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to repeal an Act creating and establishing the Saint Marys Airport Authority, approved March 4, 1964 (Ga. L. 1964, p. 2438), as amended by an Act approved April 11, 1979 (Ga. L. 1979, p. 3278); to provide for the assets and liabilities thereof; to provide for related matters; to provide a specific repealer; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Saint Marys Airport Authority; repeal Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #374 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #310 (Y: 152 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #310 (Y: 152 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 289 | |
2019-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-25 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-25 | House | House Hopper |