GA HB687 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a new charter for the City of Sugar Hill, Georgia, approved May 14, 2003 (Ga. L. 2003, p. 3546), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 10, 2014 (Ga. L. 2014, p. 3618), so as to change the corporate limits of the city; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sugar Hill, City of; change corporate limits
Sponsors
Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. Timothy Barr [R] | Rep. Tom Kirby [R] | Rep. Beth Moore [D] |
Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-25 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-25 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/56247 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/185828 |