GA HB695 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the City of Brookhaven in DeKalb County, approved April 16, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 5527), as amended, so as to increase the term limit of the mayor; to repeal expired provisions related to election of mayor and councilmembers during the first four years of the city's existence; to provide for the filling of vacancies in the offices of mayor and councilmembers of more than 12 months; to provide for the filling of vacancies in the offices of mayor and councilmembers of less than 12 months; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Brookhaven, City of; increase term limit of mayor
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Wilson [D] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Viola Davis [D] | Rep. Michele Henson [D] |
Rep. Karen Bennett [D] | Rep. Billy Mitchell [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #794 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #758 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #374 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #310 (Y: 152 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #758 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #374 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #310 (Y: 152 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 523 | |
2020-07-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2020-06-25 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-25 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-25 | House | House Hopper |