GA HB696 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for the creation of one or more community improvement districts in Forsyth County; to provide for the dissolution and reactivation of districts under certain conditions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forsyth County Community Improvement Districts Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #374 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #310 (Y: 152 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06 Effective Date
2019-05-06 Act 182
2019-05-06HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-11HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-04-02SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-29SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-29SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-26HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-25HouseHouse First Readers
2019-03-25HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback