GA HB697 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-8-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions from sales and use tax, so as to extend an exemption from state sales and use tax for five additional years regarding the sale or use of tangible personal property to certain nonprofit health centers; to extend an exemption for five additional years with respect to certain nonprofit volunteer health clinics; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; sale or use of tangible personal property to certain nonprofit health centers; extend exemption for five additional years
Sponsors
Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Butch Parrish [R] |
Rep. Mack Jackson [D] | Rep. Betty Price [R] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #693 (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #704 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Vote #534 (Y: 168 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #704 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Vote #534 (Y: 168 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 369 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-19 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-18 | House | House Hopper |