GA HB7 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to income taxes, so as to provide that retirement income received as retirement benefits from military service shall not be subject to state income tax; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to provide for an automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; retirement income received as retirement benefits from military service shall not be taxed; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. Heath Clark [R] |
Rep. Dave Belton [R] | Rep. Mike Glanton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-17 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-16 | House | House Hopper |
2018-11-16 | House | House Prefiled |